AR HB1251 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1251 is now Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Notification that HB1251 is now Act 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Improvement District And Protection District Reporting Requirements For Collection Of Assessments By County Collectors.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Improvement District And Protection District Reporting Requirements For Collection Of Assessments By County Collectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Notification that HB1251 is now Act 359 |
2021-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2021-03-11 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2021-03-11 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed as amended #1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT - SENATE |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2021-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |