AR HB1309 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Nighttime Environment Protection Act.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Nighttime Environment Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 33 N: 38 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-03-26 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-05 | House | Amendment No. 4 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-21 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-02-18 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2019-01-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed |