AR HB1310 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1310 is now Act 318
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-11 - Notification that HB1310 is now Act 318
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow School Districts That Have Been Consolidated To Sell, Preserve, Lease, Or Donate Real Property That Is No Longer Utilized By The School Districts.
Title
To Allow School Districts That Have Been Consolidated To Sell, Preserve, Lease, Or Donate Real Property That Is No Longer Utilized By The School Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | House | Notification that HB1310 is now Act 318 |
2013-03-07 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-03-07 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed |