AR HB1392 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Notification that HB1392 is now Act 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Notification that HB1392 is now Act 534
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Create A Good Samaritan Law For Architects And Engineers; To Amend The Law Concerning Architects And Engineers; And To Provide Protection To Certain Architects And Engineers Providing Volunteer Services.
Title
To Create A Good Samaritan Law For Architects And Engineers; To Amend The Law Concerning Architects And Engineers; And To Provide Protection To Certain Architects And Engineers Providing Volunteer Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Douglas House [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] | Rep. John Baine [D] | Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Notification that HB1392 is now Act 534 |
2015-03-16 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-16 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-16 | House | Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. |
2015-03-12 | House | Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Returned To the House as passed as amended. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-05 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2015-02-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed |