AR HB1481 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-12 - WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Annual Vacation Of Fire Department Employees.
Title
Concerning The Annual Vacation Of Fire Department Employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. David Kizzia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-03-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1481 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1481.pdf |