AR HB1491 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow A Nonprofit Hospital To Operate A Dental Clinic.
Title
To Allow A Nonprofit Hospital To Operate A Dental Clinic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-30 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2015-03-27 | House | The vote by which HB1491 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-02-26 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |