AR HB1561 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Notification that HB1561 is now Act 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Notification that HB1561 is now Act 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Operation Of Autonomous Vehicles Or Fully Autonomous Vehicles On The Streets And Highways Of This State Under An Autonomous Vehicle Pilot Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Authorize The Operation Of Autonomous Vehicles Or Fully Autonomous Vehicles On The Streets And Highways Of This State Under An Autonomous Vehicle Pilot Program; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Notification that HB1561 is now Act 468 |
2019-03-12 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2019-03-12 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2019-03-04 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2019-03-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |