AR HB1614 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Definition Of "employer" And The Hate Offense And Retaliation Provisions Of The Arkansas Civil Rights Act Of 1993.
Title
To Amend The Definition Of "employer" And The Hate Offense And Retaliation Provisions Of The Arkansas Civil Rights Act Of 1993.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |