AR HB1714 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1714 is now Act 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Notification that HB1714 is now Act 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal The Publication Requirement For Rules And Regulations Promulgated By The State Highway Commission.
Title
To Repeal The Publication Requirement For Rules And Regulations Promulgated By The State Highway Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Notification that HB1714 is now Act 707 |
2015-03-20 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2015-03-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2015-03-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2015-03-06 | House | Filed |