AR HB1805 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1805 is now Act 1471
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Notification that HB1805 is now Act 1471
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prevent Candidates From Running For More Than One (1) Office Under Certain Circumstances.
Title
To Prevent Candidates From Running For More Than One (1) Office Under Certain Circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. James Word [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Notification that HB1805 is now Act 1471 |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-18 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |