AR HB1806 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1806 is now Act 844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Notification that HB1806 is now Act 844
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Repeal A Section In The Arkansas Code That Grants Free Tuition To State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education For World War I Veterans.
Title
To Repeal A Section In The Arkansas Code That Grants Free Tuition To State-supported Institutions Of Higher Education For World War I Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Notification that HB1806 is now Act 844 |
2017-03-29 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2017-03-28 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned From the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned to the House as passed. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |