AR HB1816 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Require Diversity When Issuing Licenses For Dispensaries And Cultivation Facilities And When Appointing Individuals To The Medical Marijuana Commission.
Title
To Amend The Arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016; And To Require Diversity When Issuing Licenses For Dispensaries And Cultivation Facilities And When Appointing Individuals To The Medical Marijuana Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |