AR HB1821 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Require That Parking Lot Signs Indicating Spaces Dedicated For Individuals With Disabilities Display The Term "reserved".
Title
To Require That Parking Lot Signs Indicating Spaces Dedicated For Individuals With Disabilities Display The Term "reserved".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-27 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-27 | House | Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-19 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1821 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1821.pdf |