AR HB1907 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1907 is now Act 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - House Notification that HB1907 is now Act 1179
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Advertisements For Gambling Activities To Include Information Concerning Compulsive Gambling Disorders.
Title
To Require Advertisements For Gambling Activities To Include Information Concerning Compulsive Gambling Disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | House Notification that HB1907 is now Act 1179 | |
2011-04-01 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-31 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | House Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-30 | House Re-referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned To the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-21 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-17 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-17 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-17 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-16 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-03-04 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2011-03-04 | House Filed |