AR HB1975 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Died in the House at Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Adopt The Compact For A Balanced Budget; And To Adopt A Proposed Amendment To The Compact For A Balanced Budget.
Title
To Adopt The Compact For A Balanced Budget; And To Adopt A Proposed Amendment To The Compact For A Balanced Budget.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 29 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Died in the House at Sine Die |
2017-03-22 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |