AR HB1978 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Allow Quorum Court Members To Bid On County Projects And Counties To Purchase Goods Or Services From Quorum Court Members In Certain Circumstances.
Title
To Allow Quorum Court Members To Bid On County Projects And Counties To Purchase Goods Or Services From Quorum Court Members In Certain Circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-01 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-11 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB1978 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB1978.pdf |