AR HB2231 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-11 - Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Contemporaneous Filing Of A Certificate Of Merit As A Condition Of Filing Any Action For Damages Alleging Professional Negligence By A Licensed Or Registered Engineer.
Title
To Require The Contemporaneous Filing Of A Certificate Of Merit As A Condition Of Filing Any Action For Damages Alleging Professional Negligence By A Licensed Or Registered Engineer.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Recommended for study in the Interim by Joint Interim Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-11 | House | WITHDRAWN BY AUTHOR |
2013-04-05 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-05 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HB2231 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HB2231.pdf |