AR HCMR1001 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
In Respectful Memory Of Mr. James Marvin Park And In Recognition Of His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas And His Local Community.
Title
In Respectful Memory Of Mr. James Marvin Park And In Recognition Of His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas And His Local Community.
Sponsors
Rep. Davy Carter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-04-01 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-03-24 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-23 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-16 | House Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-16 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-11 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-07 | House Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCMR1001 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2011/2011R/Bills/HCMR1001.pdf |