AR HCMR1001 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
In Respectful Memory Of Mr. Bobby Gene Newman And In Recognition Of His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas, The House Of Representatives, And His Local Community.
Title
In Respectful Memory Of Mr. Bobby Gene Newman And In Recognition Of His Contributions To The State Of Arkansas, The House Of Representatives, And His Local Community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by the Governor. |
2013-04-19 | House | Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. |
2013-04-19 | House | TO BE ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned From Senate concurred in. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned To the House as concurred in. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Resolution read and concurred in. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House. |
2013-03-21 | House | Resolution received unanimous support. |
2013-03-21 | House | Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-15 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=HCMR1001 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/HCMR1001.pdf |