AR HCR1006 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-04 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Title
To Provide For An Extension Of The Regular Session Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly And To Provide For A Recess Of The General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Resolution read and concurred in. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-02 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2011-03-02 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2011-03-02 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2011-02-24 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-02-23 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2011-02-23 | House Filed |