AR HCR1011 | 2012 | 88th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For The Date Of The Sine Die Adjournment Of The Fiscal Session Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly And To Provide For Recesses Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate.
Title
To Provide For The Date Of The Sine Die Adjournment Of The Fiscal Session Of The Eighty-eighth General Assembly And To Provide For Recesses Of The House Of Representatives And The Senate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House Approved by the Governor | |
2012-02-16 | House Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office. | |
2012-02-16 | House TO BE ENROLLED | |
2012-02-16 | House Returned From Senate concurred in. | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Returned To the House as concurred in. | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Resolution read and concurred in. | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Received from the House. | |
2012-02-15 | House Read and adopted and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2012-02-14 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. | |
2012-02-14 | House Filed |