AR HR1001 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned by the Committee Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Adopt The Rules Of The House Of Representatives Of The Ninety-second General Assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - READ AND ADOPTED. (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-16HouseREAD AND ADOPTED.
2019-01-15HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-01-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback