AR HR1025 | 2024 | 94th General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - READ AND ADOPTED.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The National Park College Nighthawks Men's Basketball Team As The National Junior College Athletic Association (njcaa) Division Ii Men's National Champions.
Title
To Recognize The National Park College Nighthawks Men's Basketball Team As The National Junior College Athletic Association (njcaa) Division Ii Men's National Champions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | READ AND ADOPTED. |
2024-04-23 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2024-04-23 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2024-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2024-04-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE MANAGEMENT |
2024-04-15 | House | Filed |