AR SB1043 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1043 is now Act 1182
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Notification that SB1043 is now Act 1182
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Require The Department Of Education To Study The Education And Assistance Provided To Children Who Are Unable To Physically Attend School On A Regular Basis Due To A Medical Condition.
Title
To Require The Department Of Education To Study The Education And Assistance Provided To Children Who Are Unable To Physically Attend School On A Regular Basis Due To A Medical Condition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | Senate | Notification that SB1043 is now Act 1182 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |