AR SB1173 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1173 is now Act 1437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB1173 is now Act 1437
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Administration Of Epinephrine By School Personnel To Children Experiencing A Life-threatening Anaphylactic Reaction Due To Food Allergies.
Title
Concerning The Administration Of Epinephrine By School Personnel To Children Experiencing A Life-threatening Anaphylactic Reaction Due To Food Allergies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Notification that SB1173 is now Act 1437 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-19 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-17 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | amemdment #1 withdrawn |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for Amendment #2 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |