AR SB12 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Notification that SB12 is now Act 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-06 - Notification that SB12 is now Act 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit Level 3 Or Level 4 Sex Offenders From Being At A Swimming Area Or Children's Playground Contained Within An Arkansas State Park; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Prohibit Level 3 Or Level 4 Sex Offenders From Being At A Swimming Area Or Children's Playground Contained Within An Arkansas State Park; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Notification that SB12 is now Act 39 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-04 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-04 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-02-04 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-01-29 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-01-24 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-01-24 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Filed |