AR SB170 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Notification that SB170 is now Act 156
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish The Pregnant Woman's Protection Act.
Title
An Act To Establish The Pregnant Woman's Protection Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R] | Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Sen. Bryan King [R] | Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] |
Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] | Rep. Stephen Magie [D] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Notification that SB170 is now Act 156 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-02-21 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-02-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-02-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-02-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-02-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed |