AR SB254 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 98, Also Known As The "arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016" To Amend The Provisions Concerning The Ability Of A Dispensary To Grow Marijuana.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Constitution, Amendment 98, Also Known As The "arkansas Medical Marijuana Amendment Of 2016" To Amend The Provisions Concerning The Ability Of A Dispensary To Grow Marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The vote by which SB 254 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |