AR SB270 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Protect Property Rights Of Owners Or Lessees Of Real Property Near A Sport Shooting Range; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Protect Property Rights Of Owners Or Lessees Of Real Property Near A Sport Shooting Range; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The vote by which SB 270 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County, and Local Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed |