AR SB30 | 2018 | 91st General Assembly Fiscal
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Notification that SB30 is now Act 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Notification that SB30 is now Act 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2018-2019 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 79 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to postpone indefinitely action on the bill failed (Y: 5 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Motion to postpone indefinitely action on the bill failed (Y: 5 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Notification that SB30 is now Act 241 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2018-03-07 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2018-03-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2018-03-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Motion to postpone indefinitely action on the bill failed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed |