AR SB333 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Senate Notification that SB333 is now Act 336
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Senate Notification that SB333 is now Act 336
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding The Amount In Controversy In A Civil Action And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
Regarding The Amount In Controversy In A Civil Action And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Senate Notification that SB333 is now Act 336 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-15 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Returned From the House as passed as amended. | |
2011-03-07 | House Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-07 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-03 | House REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-03 | House Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-03 | House Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. | |
2011-03-01 | House Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 | |
2011-02-22 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-02-22 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-02-22 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Filed |