AR SB377 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Eligibility Of An Inmate Of The Department Of Correction To Participate In A Work-release Program Or Under Act 309 Of 1983.
Title
Concerning The Eligibility Of An Inmate Of The Department Of Correction To Participate In A Work-release Program Or Under Act 309 Of 1983.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-16 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-02-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-02-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Sounding of the Ballot was REQUESTED. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Filed |