AR SB487 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Conduct An Assessment And Audit Of The Culture And Climate Of The Department Of Correction.
Title
To Conduct An Assessment And Audit Of The Culture And Climate Of The Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 43 N: 43 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Returned From the House as Failed to Pass |
2019-04-24 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2019-04-24 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die Adjournment |
2019-04-08 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2019-03-20 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2019-03-20 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |