AR SB55 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB55 is now Act 843
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB55 is now Act 843
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Human Services - Division Of Medical Services Appropriation For The 2021-2022 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 31 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 31 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Notification that SB55 is now Act 843 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-15 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Motion to place on second reading for the purpose of amendment failed |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2021-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JOINT BUDGET COMMITTEE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Filed |