AR SB660 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Modernize The Concealed Handgun Licensing Framework; And Concerning The Possession Of A Handgun.
Title
To Modernize The Concealed Handgun Licensing Framework; And Concerning The Possession Of A Handgun.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-04-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB660 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB660.pdf |