AR SB682 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Regarding Death And Permanent Total Disability Claims Under The Workers’ Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948.
Title
To Amend The Law Regarding Death And Permanent Total Disability Claims Under The Workers’ Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Act No. 4 Of 1948.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |