AR SB705 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring The Coroner To Notify The Arkansas Child Death Review Panel Of The Arkansas Child Abuse/rape/domestic Violence Commission Of An Infant Death Or Death Of A Minor Child.
Title
Requiring The Coroner To Notify The Arkansas Child Death Review Panel Of The Arkansas Child Abuse/rape/domestic Violence Commission Of An Infant Death Or Death Of A Minor Child.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned to the Senate. |
2013-05-17 | House | Died on House Calendar at Sine Die adjournment. |
2013-03-14 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Filed |