AR SB719 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish A Right Of Privacy Concerning Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Vaccination Status; To Establish A Grant Program With Distribution From Covid-19 Relief Funds; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Establish A Right Of Privacy Concerning Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19) Vaccination Status; To Establish A Grant Program With Distribution From Covid-19 Relief Funds; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Filed |