AR SB731 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB731 is now Act 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB731 is now Act 1142
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Prepayment Of Arkansas Compensating Use Tax On The Same Basis As Prepayment Of Arkansas Gross Receipts Tax And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
An Act To Require Prepayment Of Arkansas Compensating Use Tax On The Same Basis As Prepayment Of Arkansas Gross Receipts Tax And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Senate Notification that SB731 is now Act 1142 | |
2011-04-01 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-31 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-29 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE | |
2011-03-29 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Filed |