AR SB81 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB81 is now Act 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Notification that SB81 is now Act 1118
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Improve The Effectiveness Of Public School Alternative Learning Environments.
Title
To Improve The Effectiveness Of Public School Alternative Learning Environments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Senate Notification that SB81 is now Act 1118 | |
2011-04-01 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned from the House as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned To the Senate as passed. | |
2011-03-31 | House EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-31 | House Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-03-29 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-17 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-17 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-17 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-03-03 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Filed |