AR SB83 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Notification that SB83 is now Act 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Notification that SB83 is now Act 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Add A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education To The State-supported Institutions That Are Exempt From Certain State Laws That Govern The Construction Of Public Facilities.
Title
To Add A State-supported Institution Of Higher Education To The State-supported Institutions That Are Exempt From Certain State Laws That Govern The Construction Of Public Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Breanne Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Cloud [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Notification that SB83 is now Act 95 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-02-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-02-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-01-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Filed |