AR SB867 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit The Use Of A Self-service Display To Sell Lottery Tickets.
Title
To Prohibit The Use Of A Self-service Display To Sell Lottery Tickets.
Sponsors
Sen. Sue Madison [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned From the House as requested. | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned To the Senate as requested. | |
2011-03-29 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES | |
2011-03-29 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |