AR SB9 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Encourage Charitable Giving And Eliminate Perverse And Absurd Taxes And Disincentives On Charitable Giving; And To Exempt Certain Withdrawals Of Stock From The Sales And Use Tax.
Title
To Encourage Charitable Giving And Eliminate Perverse And Absurd Taxes And Disincentives On Charitable Giving; And To Exempt Certain Withdrawals Of Stock From The Sales And Use Tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-23 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2016-11-23 | Senate | Filed |