AR SB907 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning Background Checks For Individuals Who Volunteer In High School Mentoring Programs.
Title
Concerning Background Checks For Individuals Who Volunteer In High School Mentoring Programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB907 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2013/2013R/Bills/SB907.pdf |