AR SB961 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB961 is now Act 1261
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB961 is now Act 1261
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Election Crimes.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Certain Election Crimes.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan King [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB961 is now Act 1261 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-06 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-04-06 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-06 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Filed |