AR SJR5 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Senate Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Financial Reform For Counties And Municipalities.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Arkansas Constitution Concerning Financial Reform For Counties And Municipalities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jake Files [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - Clincher motion failed of adoption. (Y: 47 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Motion for immediate consideration of SJR5 passed. (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - The vote by which SJR5 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 19 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Motion for immediate consideration of SJR5 passed. (Y: 77 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - The vote by which SJR5 Failed to Pass was expunged. (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 19 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and adopted. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Senate Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Senate DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. | |
2011-04-01 | Senate ORDERED ENROLLED | |
2011-04-01 | Senate Returned From the House as concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | House Returned To Senate concurred in. | |
2011-04-01 | House Clincher motion failed of adoption. | |
2011-04-01 | House Read the third time, concurred in, ordered transmitted to the Senate. | |
2011-04-01 | House Motion for immediate consideration of SJR5 passed. | |
2011-04-01 | House The vote by which SJR5 Failed to Pass was expunged. | |
2011-04-01 | House EXPUNGED | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned From the Senate as requested. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned To the House as requested. | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Returned From the House as failed to concur in. | |
2011-03-31 | House Returned To the Senate having failed to pass. | |
2011-03-31 | House CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED | |
2011-03-31 | House Read the third time and failed. | |
2011-03-30 | House Returned by the Committee Do Pass | |
2011-03-29 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE | |
2011-03-29 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read the third time and adopted. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-16 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-14 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-03-09 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Filed |