AR SR5 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Recognize The Positive Impact Of The Arkansas 4-h Program On Our Youth And To Celebrate 4-h Day On February 16, 2017.
Title
To Recognize The Positive Impact Of The Arkansas 4-h Program On Our Youth And To Celebrate 4-h Day On February 16, 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Maloch [D] | Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] |
Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D] | Sen. John Cooper [R] | Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R] | Sen. Jane English [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read the third time and adopted. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SR5 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2017/2017R/Bills/SR5.pdf |