AZ HB2090 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Land department; licensing time frames
Title
Land department; licensing time frames
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2017-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |