AZ HB2103 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Homemade food products; regulation; exception
Title
Homemade food products; regulation; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-11 | House final reading , voting: (47-11-2-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-06 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (43-14-3-0) | |
2011-02-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-19 | House read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |