AZ HB2112 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-county water district; directors; elections
Title
Multi-county water district; directors; elections
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] | Rep. Diego Espinoza [D] |
Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 289 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2017-05-08 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-26 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-26 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-6-3-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-25-4-0) |
2017-02-13 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-02-13 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Directors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Special Taxing Districts
Water Conservation Districts
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Special Taxing Districts
Water Conservation Districts
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 3708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 3709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |